Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Recommitted to Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 621
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
File Number 186
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
House Calendar Number 130
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/17
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|