House | 05/14/2015 | File Number 825 | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 510 | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7095 | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | File Number 81 | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | House Calendar Number 77 | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/13/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |