House | 05/11/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 485 | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | File Number 677 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | House Calendar Number 439 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/13/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |