House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Public Act 15-64
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 514
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
File Number 364
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
House Calendar Number 221
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|