House | 06/03/2015 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 9261 | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 512 | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | File Number 366 | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | House Calendar Number 223 | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 02/13/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |