Senate | 04/22/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Public Act 15-3 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Signed by Governor in Original | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 370 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | File Number 467 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | House Calendar Number 296 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 02/13/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |