House | 04/02/2015 | File Number 413 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | House Calendar Number 271 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Public Hearing 03/16 | ||
House | 02/13/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |