House
|
06/30/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2015
|
Public Act 15-228
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8326
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 385
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
File Number 414
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
House Calendar Number 272
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|