House | 04/16/2015 | File Number 664 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | House Calendar Number 440 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 02/18/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |