House | 04/01/2015 | File Number 369 | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | House Calendar Number 225 | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/18/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |