House | 04/22/2015 | House Designated House Amendment Schedule B 6275 | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 6257 | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 6257 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | File Number 473 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | House Calendar Number 303 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |