House | 03/16/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |