House
|
06/30/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Public Act 15-168
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
File Number 835
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 522
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6916
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
File Number 284
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
House Calendar Number 180
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|