House | 05/12/2015 | File Number 812 | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | House Calendar Number 543 | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/11/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |