House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Public Act 15-66
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
File Number 745
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 435
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 6417
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6391
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
File Number 235
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
House Calendar Number 166
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|