House | 05/11/2015 | File Number 803 | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | House Calendar Number 542 | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/11/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Public Hearing 04/27 | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |