House | 05/31/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 637 | ||
House | 05/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8679 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | File Number 582 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | House Calendar Number 372 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |