House | 04/29/2015 | File Number 753 | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | House Calendar Number 495 | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/28/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |