House
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2015
|
Public Act 15-195
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
File Number 836
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 523
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7079
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
File Number 722
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
House Calendar Number 458
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/30
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|