House | 04/29/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | File Number 678 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | House Calendar Number 441 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |