Connecticut 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06852 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/15/2015

                            House Bill No. 6852

Public Act No. 15-169

AN ACT CONCERNING THE MUNICIPAL REIMBURSEMENT AND REVENUE ACCOUNT. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: 

Section 1. Section 328 of public act 13-247 is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2015): 

(a) There is established an account to be known as the "municipal reimbursement and revenue account" which shall be a separate, nonlapsing account within the General Fund. The account shall contain any moneys required by law to be deposited in the account. 

(b) Moneys [in] transferred to the account in accordance with section 87 of public act 13-247 shall be expended by the Office of Policy and Management as follows: (1) For the Nutmeg Network, [one million eighty-seven thousand dollars in each of fiscal years ending June 30, 2014, and June 30, 2015] two million one hundred seventy-four thousand dollars; (2) for a tax incidence study, [five hundred thousand dollars in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, and two hundred thousand dollars in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015] seven hundred thousand dollars; and (3) for the universal chart of accounts, four hundred fifty thousand dollars. [in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014] Such moneys for the universal chart of accounts may be used to reimburse expenses incurred on or after July 1, 2013.