Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
Public Act 15-197
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
File Number 901
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 600
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7827
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
File Number 287
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
House Calendar Number 183
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations
|
|
|