Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
Public Act 15-198
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 616
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
File Number 913
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8387
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
File Number 583
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
House Calendar Number 373
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|