House | 03/20/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |