House | 05/12/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | File Number 584 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | House Calendar Number 374 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Public Hearing 03/16 | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |