House | 05/15/2015 | File Number 837 | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 516 | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6913 | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | File Number 204 | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | House Calendar Number 138 | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |