House | 05/08/2015 | File Number 794 | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 473 | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6300 | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | File Number 206 | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | House Calendar Number 140 | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |