House | 03/31/2015 | File Number 323 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | House Calendar Number 205 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |