House | 04/21/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | File Number 379 | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | House Calendar Number 235 | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |