House | 04/09/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | File Number 184 | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | House Calendar Number 127 | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |