House | 06/30/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/11/2015 | Special Act 15-15 | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8556 | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 537 | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | File Number 585 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | House Calendar Number 375 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |