House
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Public Act 15-173
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 515
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
File Number 586
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
House Calendar Number 376
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|