House
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2015
|
Public Act 15-200
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
File Number 872
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 561
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7334
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
File Number 527
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
House Calendar Number 333
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|