House | 04/30/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | File Number 207 | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | House Calendar Number 141 | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |