House | 05/26/2015 | File Number 892 | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 589 | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8083 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | File Number 325 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | House Calendar Number 207 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |