House | 05/11/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Public Act 15-5 | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 388 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | File Number 189 | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | House Calendar Number 133 | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |