House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Public Act 15-55
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
File Number 828
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 499
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6800
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
File Number 418
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
House Calendar Number 276
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|