House | 05/18/2015 | File Number 851 | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 543 | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6457 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | File Number 419 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | House Calendar Number 277 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |