House | 04/16/2015 | File Number 681 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | House Calendar Number 444 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |