House | 04/20/2015 | File Number 724 | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | House Calendar Number 460 | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |