House | 05/31/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 636 | ||
House | 05/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8615 | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | File Number 238 | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | House Calendar Number 169 | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |