House
|
07/07/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2015
|
Public Act 15-229
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 645
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7339
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
File Number 288
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
House Calendar Number 184
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|