House
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Public Act 15-174
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7676
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
File Number 809
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 487
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 6998
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6923
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
File Number 627
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
House Calendar Number 397
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|