House | 05/11/2015 | File Number 810 | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 489 | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6497 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | File Number 665 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | House Calendar Number 445 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |