House
|
05/26/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Public Act 15-14
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
File Number 796
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 475
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6665
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
File Number 628
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
House Calendar Number 398
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/16
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|