House
|
06/03/2015
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 9390
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
File Number 893
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 586
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8103
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 7413
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Bill Passed Temporarily
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 7413
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
File Number 666
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
House Calendar Number 446
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|