House | 04/08/2015 | File Number 532 | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | House Calendar Number 339 | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |