House | 05/22/2015 | File Number 885 | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 576 | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6919 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | File Number 480 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | House Calendar Number 310 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |