Senate | 05/27/2015 | File Number 902 | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 597 | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8237 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | File Number 424 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | House Calendar Number 250 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |