House | 04/08/2015 | File Number 536 | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | House Calendar Number 343 | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |